Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055226

EP1055226 - SYSTEM FOR USING SILENCE IN SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Li
15360 N.E. 66th Court
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/33]
Former [2011/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2000/48]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date99906851.309.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999US02803
Priority number, dateUS1998002684120.02.1998         Original published format: US 26841
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942991
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055226
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055226
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/187
[2016/42]
Former International [2000/48]G10L5/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/33]
Former [2000/48]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON STILLE IN SPRACHERKENNUNG[2000/48]
English:SYSTEM FOR USING SILENCE IN SPEECH RECOGNITION[2000/48]
French:SYSTEME D'UTILISATION DU SILENCE DANS LA RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2000National basic fee paid 
18.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
21.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2016
28.06.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2017Fee for grant paid
29.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2009
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0762358  (ZITON SA PROPRIETARY LIMITED [ZA]) [A] 3,4,11,12,18,30,40 * abstract * * page 2, line 45 - line 50 * * page 3, line 5 - line 8 *
 [A]  - COLE R A ET AL, "Experiments with a spoken dialogue system for taking the US census", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (19971101), vol. 23, no. 3, page 243-260, XP004112587 [A] 1,2,9,10,15-17,27,28,32,33,38,41 * abstract * * page 245, column L, line 32 - column R, line 10 * * page 248, column L, line 1 - line 12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(97)00049-6
ExaminationEP1012827
    - "AUTOMATIC SPEECH SEGMENT BOUNDARY DETECTION USING MARKOV MODELS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19901201), vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0018-8689, page 323/324, XP000108438
    - JELINEK F, "THE DEVELOPMENT OF AN EXPERIMENTAL DISCRETE DICTATION RECOGNIZER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19851101), vol. 73, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1616 - 1624, XP001197009