Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054618

EP1054618 - DETECTION, IMAGING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BREAST TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NON-INVASIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC.
4014 Pine Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANCE, Britton
206 Bruce Court
Marathon, FL 33050 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/48]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99906917.211.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999US02953
Priority number, dateUS19980074504P11.02.1998         Original published format: US 74504 P
US19980098018P26.08.1998         Original published format: US 98018 P
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940840
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054618
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054618
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/48]
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS, ABBILDUNG UND KENNZEICHNUNG VON BRUSTUMOREN[2000/48]
English:DETECTION, IMAGING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BREAST TUMORS[2000/48]
French:DETECTION, VISUALISATION ET CARACTERISATION DE CARCINOMES MAMMAIRES[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2000National basic fee paid 
11.08.2000Search fee paid 
11.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
27.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2006Fee for grant paid
31.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9502987  (NON INVASIVE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6,7,10,17,30-34 * page 2, line 8 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 1 - line 12 * * page 8, line 8 - line 23 * * page 9, line 6 - line 16 * * page 14, line 17 - line 35 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[XP]US5853370  (CHANCE BRITTON [US], et al);
 [YP]US5845639  (HOCHMAN DARYL [US], et al);
 [YP]US5807263  (CHANCE BRITTON [US]);
 [Y]US5564417  (CHANCE BRITTON [US])
by applicantUS5119815
 US5386827
 WO9620638
 WO9720494
 WO9325145
 US5187672
 WO9220273
 US5673701