Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053077

EP1053077 - ABRASIVE-MEDIUM EJECTOR GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.07.2016  [2016/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
[2003/20]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co.
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SEITTER, Ralph
Rembrandtstrasse 22
D-71522 Backnang / DE
02 / SVOBODA, Bohumir
Kapruner Weg 29
D-71522 Backnang / DE
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Boehme, Ulrich
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Böhme, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99907398.421.01.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999EP00396
Priority number, dateDE199810423304.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804233
[2000/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939874
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053077
Date:22.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053077
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B24C5/02, B24C7/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:STRAHLMITTEL-INJEKTORPISTOLE[2000/47]
English:ABRASIVE-MEDIUM EJECTOR GUN[2000/47]
French:PISTOLET EJECTEUR POUR AGENT DE GRENAILLAGE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2000National basic fee paid 
06.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
06.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2002Fee for grant paid
11.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
LU21.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
SE04.03.2003
[2016/29]
Former [2006/14]FR04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
LU21.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
SE04.03.2003
Former [2004/39]GB04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
LU21.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
SE04.03.2003
Former [2004/28]GB04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
BE31.01.2003
SE04.03.2003
Former [2004/22]GB04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE04.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5099619  (ROSE LEO J [US]) [X] 1,14 * column 3, lines 17-47; figure 1 * [A] 2-4;
 [A]US3828478  (BEMIS E) [A] 1-3,15 * column 4, lines 3-24 *;
 [A]US2200587  (TIRRELL LESLIE L) [A] 1-3,14,15 * page 3, column R, line 55 - page 4, column L, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0059173  (CISA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-4,6,7,14,15 * page 13, lines 15-20; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4057940  (WEMMER OTTO) [A] 14,25 * column 3, lines 56-59; figures 1,2 *