blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1053325 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1053325



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 543
22.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 19
22.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 51
22.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
22.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
14.04.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 14
14.04.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 3
24.06.1999 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 8
25.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
25.06.1999 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 8
03.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 74
17.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
17.08.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.1999 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 44
24.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
08.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
14.10.1999 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 3
26.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
22.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.02.2000 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.03.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
23.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
23.03.2000 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.03.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 2
08.05.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.05.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.05.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.05.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
20.06.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
24.08.2000 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
24.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.01.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.11.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 15
02.12.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.06.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.07.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
23.07.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
01.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
24.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.11.2003 Description Search / examination 4
24.11.2003 Description Search / examination 5
24.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2003 Annex Search / examination 3
27.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 75
27.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
04.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
24.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1