Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1053325 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1053325



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 543
10.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.02.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.10.2005 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
04.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
04.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 75
24.11.2003 Annex Search / examination 3
24.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2003 Description Search / examination 4
24.11.2003 Description Search / examination 5
24.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
01.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
23.07.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.07.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
17.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.06.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.12.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 15
11.01.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
24.08.2000 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
20.06.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
08.05.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.05.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
08.05.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.05.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 2
27.03.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.03.2000 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
23.03.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
23.03.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.02.2000 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
14.10.1999 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 3
14.10.1999 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
08.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 44
24.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
19.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.08.1999 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 74
25.06.1999 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 8
25.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
24.06.1999 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 8
24.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 3
14.04.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
14.04.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 14
22.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
22.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 51
22.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 19