blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1053325


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.11.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.12.2006  [2006/50]
19.11.2005 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]
18.10.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.07.2005 Change - divisional application(s) published on  07.09.2005  [2005/36]
12.07.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.04.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.09.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.06.2003 Examination report or reply
13.06.2003 First examination report
19.02.2003 Renewal fee
29.11.2002 Change - applicant published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
01.03.2002 Renewal fee
14.02.2001 Renewal fee
06.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
24.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2000 Change - extension states
03.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
14.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication