blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1053325 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP05076599 EP06075362 EP06075363 EP99907476



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8597656Global Dossier 03.12.2013B2
US2012269835 25.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113324509 13.12.2011
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
US64030609 17.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8097257Global Dossier 17.01.2012B2
US2010209444 19.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9906600 02.02.1999
US60156500 03.08.2000
US64030609 17.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8044183Global Dossier 25.10.2011B2
US2010204458 12.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
US72269110 12.03.2010
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
US60156500 03.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4768121BGlobal Dossier 07.09.2011B2
JP2002502604 29.01.2002A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1659179Global Dossier 15.06.2011B1
EP1659179 17.01.2007A3
EP1659179 24.05.2006A2
Priority number Date
EP99907476 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1659178Global Dossier 31.03.2010B1
EP1659178 17.01.2007A3
EP1659178 24.05.2006A2
Priority number Date
EP99907476 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1584685Global Dossier 13.04.2011B1
EP1584685 07.12.2005A3
EP1584685 12.10.2005A2
Priority number Date
EP99907476 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1053325Global Dossier 04.01.2006B1
EP1053325 22.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU737337B 16.08.2001B2
AU2722099 23.08.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9907691 31.05.2011B1
BR9907691 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2319309 10.08.2010C
CA2319309 12.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2584482 27.03.2012C
CA2584482 12.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
CA2319309 02.02.1999
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1227360C 16.11.2005C
CN1295616 16.05.2001A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1110180T 14.01.2015T1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP06075362 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1111672T 07.10.2015T1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1111831T 07.10.2015T1
Priority number Date
EP06075363 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69929310T 03.08.2006T2
DE69929310D 30.03.2006D1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1584685T 11.07.2011T3
Priority number Date
EP99907476 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1659178T 12.07.2010T3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1659179T 10.10.2011T3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2362783T 13.07.2011T3
Priority number Date
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2367998T 11.11.2011T3
Priority number Date
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9802543D 01.04.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9802650D 01.04.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1033838 03.11.2006A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1083026 09.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
HK01103307 11.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1093521 09.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
HK06101448 11.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1093522 17.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
HK06101448 11.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU228467 28.03.2013B1
HU0102639 28.04.2004A3
HU0102639 28.11.2001A2
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL137442 13.04.2008A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL137442D 24.07.2001D0
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL179010D 08.03.2007D0
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL188875 31.08.2011A
IL188875D 11.02.2009D0
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO328507B 08.03.2010B1
NO20003958L 04.10.2000L
NO20003958D 04.08.2000D0
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO331719B 05.03.2012B1
NO20091665L 04.10.2000L
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ506086 31.01.2003A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL342852 16.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1053325T 30.06.2006T1
Priority number Date
EP99907476 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP9900660 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1584685T 29.07.2011T1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP05076599 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1659178T 30.07.2010T1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
EP06075362 02.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1659179T 28.10.2011T1
Priority number Date
EP06075363 02.02.1999
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA9900872 04.08.2000B
Priority number Date
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9940188Global Dossier 14.10.1999A3
WO9940188 12.08.1999A2
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100824105BGlobal Dossier 21.04.2008B1
KR20060067977 20.06.2006A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2009201510Global Dossier 10.09.2009A
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR018064 31.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT315088T 15.02.2006T
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT462788T 15.04.2010T
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT505542T 15.04.2011T
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT513042T 15.07.2011T
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ298347 05.09.2007B6
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ298364 05.09.2007B6
CZ20002869 17.01.2001A3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69942214D 12.05.2010D1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69943359D 26.05.2011D1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK1053325T 22.05.2006T3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2255248T 16.06.2006T3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2342416T 06.07.2010T3
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1053325E 31.05.2006E
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1584685E 17.06.2011E
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1659178E 28.06.2010E
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1659179E 16.09.2011E
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SA1151 20.08.2006B1
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR200002284T 21.11.2000T2
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI238853B 01.09.2005B
Priority number Date
GB9802650 06.02.1998
GB9802543 05.02.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1584685
 EP1659178
 EP1659179