Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053325

EP1053325 - TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN DERIVATIVES FROM THE MAGE FAMILY, AND NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES ENCODING THEM, USED FOR THE PREPARATION OF FUSION PROTEINS AND OF COMPOSITIONS FOR VACCINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[N/P]
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
Glaxosmithkline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A.
89 rue de l'Institut
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / CABEZON SILVA, Teresa SmithKline Beecham Biolog.SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / COHEn, Joseph SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
03 / SLAOUI, Moncef SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
04 / VINALS BASSOLS, Carlota SmithKline Beecham Biol.SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William , et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date99907476.802.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999EP00660
Priority number, dateGB1998000254305.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9802543
GB1998000265006.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9802650
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9940188
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1053325
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053325
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, A61K39/39, A61K48/00, C07K1/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
Extension statesSI25.07.2000
TitleGerman:TUMORASSOZIIERTE ANTIGENDERIVATE DER MAGE-FAMILIE, NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN DIE DAFÜR KODIEREN, ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FUSIONSPROTEINEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IMPFUNG[2000/47]
English:TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN DERIVATIVES FROM THE MAGE FAMILY, AND NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES ENCODING THEM, USED FOR THE PREPARATION OF FUSION PROTEINS AND OF COMPOSITIONS FOR VACCINATION[2000/47]
French:DERIVES ANTIGENES ASSOCIES AUX TUMEURS DE LA FAMILLE MAGE, ET SEQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CODANT CES DERIVES, UTILISES POUR LA PREPARAITON DE PROTEINES DE FUSION ET DE COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES A LA VACCINATION[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2000National basic fee paid 
25.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2005Fee for grant paid
01.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05076599.9  / EP1584685
EP06075362.1  / EP1659178
EP06075363.9  / EP1659179
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9504542  (SIDNEY JOHN C ;CYTEL CORP (US); FIKES JOHN D (US); LIVINGSTON BRIA) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-18 * page 4, lines 20-31 * * page 5, lines 24-30 * * page 11, lines 1-11 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 9 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO9639524  (CORIXA CORP) [X] 1,2,8-18 * page 1, lines 12-16 * * page 3, lines 20-26 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 9 * * page 8, lines 3-23 * * examples 17,18 *;
 [X]WO9610413  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES) [X] 1,8-18 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 6 * * page 11, lines 10-26 * * page 16, lines 10-14 *;
 [XA]  - CARREL S ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies against recombinant- MAGE -1 protein identify a cross-reacting 72-kDa antigen which is co-expressed with MAGE -1 protein in melanoma cells.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1996 JUL 29) 67 (3) 417-22., XP002111871 [X] 1,3,8-12,18 * abstract * * page 417, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 418, column L, paragraph 4 * [A] 19,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19960729)67:3<417::AID-IJC17>3.0.CO;2-4
 [X]  - KOCHER T ET AL, "Identification and intracellular location of MAGE -3 gene product.", CANCER RESEARCH, (1995 JUN 1) 55 (11) 2236-9., XP002111872 [X] 1,3,8-11 * page 2236, column R, paragraphs 2,3 *
 [X]  - MAEURER M J ET AL, "New treatment options for patients with melanoma: review of melanoma -derived T - cell epitope -based peptide vaccines.", MELANOMA RESEARCH, (1996 FEB) 6 (1) 11-24. REF: 102, XP002111873 [X] 1,8-20 * page 14, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 18, column L, paragraph 3 - page 21, column R, paragraph 2 * * table 1 *