Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1062088

EP1062088 - Tabletting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/52]DEVICE FOR MOULDING FLOWABLE SOLIDS
[2001/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HIEKE, André
Osterwiese 38
D-38162 Hordorf / DE
02 / GRISCHKE, Martin
Im Loch 11
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
03 / BRAND, Jochen
Reuter-Strasse 23
D-38126 Braunschweig / DE
 [2001/05]
Former [2000/52]01 / HIEKE, André
Osterwiese 38
D-38162 Hordorf / DE
02 / GRISCHKE, Martin
Fasanenring 76
D-38176 Wendeburg / DE
03 / BRAND, Jochen
Leopoldstrasse 11
D-38100 Braunschweig / DE
Representative(s)Einsel, Martin
Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a
38102 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Einsel, Martin
Patentanwälte, Einsel & Kollegen, Jasperalle 1a
38102 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date99907626.812.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999EP01608
Priority number, dateDE1998204550U13.03.1998         Original published format: DE 29804550 U
DE199811096913.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19810969
US1998016441730.09.1998         Original published format: US 164417
[2000/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947346
Date:23.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1062088
Date:27.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1062088
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B30B11/02, B30B15/06, C23C16/26, C23C16/30
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/52]
TitleGerman:Tablettierwerkzeug[2001/36]
English:Tabletting tool[2001/36]
French:Outil pour la fabrication de comprimés[2001/36]
Former [2000/52]VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERPRESSEN VON FLIESSFÖRMIGEN FESTSTOFFEN
Former [2000/52]DEVICE FOR MOULDING FLOWABLE SOLIDS
Former [2000/52]DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE DES MATIERES SOLIDES APTES A L'ECOULEMENT
Entry into regional phase07.09.2000National basic fee paid 
07.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
27.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
24.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2003Fee for grant paid
09.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5026415  (YAMAMOTO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * column 4, line 57 - line 61 * * column 10, line 30 - line 33; figures 18,19,23; claims 1-3; tables 12,14,16 * [Y] 7-9,11,12;
 [XY]JPH09194216  ;
 [X]JPH08259241  ;
 [X]JPH0840731  ;
 [X]JPH04154634  ;
 [X]JPH04154633  ;
 [X]JPH02283627  ;
 [X]US5008002  (UNO KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0509875  (CARBIONIC SYSTEME [FR]) [X] 1 * column 11, line 44 - line 48 *;
 [Y]JPH02107532  ;
 [Y]US5266398  (HIOKI TATSUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * claim 1 *;
 [DY]EP0625588  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DY] 5,6 * claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]DE29619564U  (NOTTER WERKZEUGBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPH06218587  ;
 [Y]US5352493  (DORFMAN VENIAMIN [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 5; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4851808  (SUGATA MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 20 - line 40 *;
 [PX]EP0885983  (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [PX] 1,3-6 * example 1; claim 1 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, [X] 1,3,4,10 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,11,12
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920916), vol. 016, no. 443, Database accession no. (C - 0985), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910207), vol. 015, no. 052, Database accession no. (C - 0803), [X] 1,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900705), vol. 014, no. 314, Database accession no. (C - 0737), [Y] 5,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941109), vol. 018, no. 585, Database accession no. (M - 1700), [Y] 11 * abstract *