EP0988752 - A TV RECEIVER WITH AN ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE (EPG) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGEN, Josephus, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN DE SLUIS, Bartel, M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RYPKEMA, Jouke, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99907814.0 | 29.03.1999 | [2000/13] | WO1999IB00534 | Priority number, date | EP19980201121 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: EP 98201121 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9953688 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0988752 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988752 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/475 (KR);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/44218 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/13] | Title | German: | FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER MIT ELEKTRONISCHER PROGRAMMZEITSCHRIFT | [2000/13] | English: | A TV RECEIVER WITH AN ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE (EPG) | [2000/13] | French: | TELEVISEUR A GUIDE ELECTRONIQUE DES EMISSIONS (EPG) | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 14.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.08.2006 | DE | 10.11.2006 | GB | 29.03.2007 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/21] | DE | 10.11.2006 | |
GB | 29.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | DE | 10.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0721253 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [A]EP0742669 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO9607270 (YUEN HENRY C [US], et al); | [AP]GB2326547 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US5694176 (BRUETTE JEFF [US], et al) |