EP1055081 - CONNECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESAB AB Box 8004 402 77 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Esab AB Box 8004 402 77 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDMARK, Ake Röforsvägen 6 B S-695 30 Laxa / SE | [2000/48] | Application number, filing date | 99908005.4 | 19.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999SE00234 | Priority number, date | SE19980000516 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: SE 9800516 | [2000/48] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942756 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055081 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055081 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/08, B21C37/29, B29C65/64 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
B29C65/66 (EP);
B25B27/00 (EP);
B25B27/10 (EP);
B29C65/56 (EP);
B29C65/58 (EP);
B29C65/64 (EP);
B29C65/7802 (EP);
B29C66/522 (EP);
B29C66/53247 (EP);
B29C66/61 (EP);
B29C66/74281 (EP);
B29C66/74283 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/861 (EP);
F16L41/08 (EP);
H02G3/22 (EP);
B29C2793/0018 (EP);
B29C66/02242 (EP);
B29C66/12441 (EP);
B29C66/12469 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/02242, B29C65/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [2000/48] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2000/48] | English: | CONNECTION DEVICE | [2000/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1999 | Translation filed | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.04.2007 | FR | 11.04.2007 | IT | 11.04.2007 | LI | 11.04.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | CH | 11.04.2007 | |
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 07.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | CH | 11.04.2007 | |
LI | 11.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1884602 (DILLHOEFER JR HENRY M); | [A]US2482944 (SHORE RICHARD B); | [A]SE380606 (GEBELIUS SVEN RUNO VILHELM); | [A]DE4128632 | Examination | EP0253630 |