Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972349

EP0972349 - INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION USING MODAL MOMENT ESTIMATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Dynamics Decision Systems, Inc.
8220 East Roosevelt Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85257 / US
[2002/14]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BERGSTROM, Chad, Scott
501 S. Oak
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
02 / CHUPRUN, Jeffrey, Scott
9034 E. Camino Del Santo
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
03 / KLEIDER, John, Eric
8501 E. Turney Avenue
Scottsdale, AZ 85251 / US
04 / GUZEK, Amy, Michelle
10605 E. Beechnut Drive
Chandler, AZ 85248 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/14]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date99908084.928.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999US01897
Priority number, dateUS1998001687730.01.1998         Original published format: US 16877
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939445
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972349
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/12, H04B1/713, H04B7/005, H04K3/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SCHÄTZWERTEN MODALER MOMENTE[2000/03]
English:INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION USING MODAL MOMENT ESTIMATES[2000/03]
French:SUPPRESSION D'INTERFERENCES A L'AIDE D'ESTIMATIONS DE MOMENT DE MODE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
13.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/18]
29.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US5271038  (CAI KHIEM V) [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 28 - line 34 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 24 - line 29 * * figures 2A-2D * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4613978  (KURTH RICHARD R ET AL) [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - line 66 * * column 4, line 3 - line 14 * * column 4, line 24 - line 28 * * column 7, line 4 - line 43 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5289194  (SCHLOSSER THOMAS W) [A] 1,4,6,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 37 * * column 3, line 56 - line 66 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 23 *;
 [A]US5018088  (HIGBIE JAMES H) [A] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 18 * * column 8, line 5 - line 12 * * column 9, line 8 - line 16 * * column 10, line 24 - line 36 * * column 13, line 17 - line 22 * * column 15, line 7 - line 20 *;
 [A]US3833797  (GROBMAN L ET AL) [A] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - line 46 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 4, line 26 - line 30 *;
 [A]  - WONG R S C ET AL, "DENOISING OF LO0W SNR SIGNALS USING COMPOSITE WAVELET SHRINKAGE", STAHL UND EISEN, (19970820), pages 302 - 305, XP000804652 [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [00II] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACRIM.1997.619960