Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055119

EP1055119 - BALL GRID ARRAY RE-WORK ASSEMBLY WITH X-RAY INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glenbrook Technologies Inc.
P.O. Box 468
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ZWEIG, Gilbert
24 Stiles Avenue
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
02 / ZWEIG, David
12 Ridge Road
Randolph, NJ 07869 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99908134.211.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999US03077
Priority number, dateUS1998002301411.02.1998         Original published format: US 23014
US1999024740410.02.1999         Original published format: US 247404
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9941597
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055119
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/04
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2000/48]
TitleGerman:LÖTBALLGITTERWIEDERVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNTERSUCHUNGSSYSTEM[2000/48]
English:BALL GRID ARRAY RE-WORK ASSEMBLY WITH X-RAY INSPECTION SYSTEM[2000/48]
French:ENSEMBLE POUR LE REAGENCEMENT DE GRILLE A BOULES, AVEC SYSTEME D'INSPECTION AUX RAYONS X[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2000National basic fee paid 
08.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
04.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/43]
19.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5590170  (ZWEIG GILBERT [US]) [DA] 1,14,21,34 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9717605  (MACROTRON PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES [DE], et al) [A] 1,14,21,34 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]US5184768  (HALL ROBERT S [US], et al) [DA] 1,14,21,34 * claim 7 *