Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992172

EP0992172 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A HANDOFF IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH AS A HARD HANDOFF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  24.10.2008
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2005/32]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ODENWALDER, Joseph, P.
14967 Rancho Real
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2007/29]Knospe, Michael
Howrey LLP Rechtsanwälte Campo Sentilo Gmunder Strasse 53
81379 München / DE
Former [2007/18]Knospe, Michael
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Prannerstraße 10
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/07](deleted)
...
Former [2006/39]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2006/35]Bardehle, Heinz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Former [2000/15]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99908139.112.02.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999US03088
Priority number, dateUS19980074733P13.02.1998         Original published format: US 74733 P
US1999024870011.02.1999         Original published format: US 248700
US1999024870111.02.1999         Original published format: US 248701
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941934
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992172
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992172
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN DES WEITERREICHENS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, WIE BEISPIELSWEISE HARTES WEITERREICHEN[2000/15]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A HANDOFF IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH AS A HARD HANDOFF[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LE TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, DU TYPE TRANSFERT STRICT[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
07.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2005Fee for grant paid
12.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05007867.4  / EP1558050
EP07015116.2  / EP1848239
EP07016648.3  / EP1855501
EP09006886.7  / EP2091284
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2006/25]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.2006   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
13.07.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.01.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.05.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.09.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/48]
Appeal following opposition07.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1311/08
22.09.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.08.2005
BE10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
CY10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
IE13.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/22]AT10.08.2005
BE10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
IE13.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT10.08.2005
BE10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/26]AT10.08.2005
BE10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
DK10.11.2005
GR10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT10.08.2005
BE10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT10.08.2005
CH10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT10.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9729611  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1,2,7,20,25,26 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 3 * * page 22, line 6 - line 17 * * page 28, line 1 - line 12 * * page 29, line 3 - line 16 * * figures 1,2,7,12,14A *;
 [A]EP0667726  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3-6 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 35 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - SATARASINGHE P, "A NOVEL METHOD FOR CDMA HARD HANDOFF", COMMUNICATIONS: THE KEY TO GLOBAL PROSPERITY. GLOBECOM 1996, LONDON, NOV. 18 - 22, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19961118), vol. 3, pages 1766 - 1768, XP000748752 [A] 15 * page 1767, left-hand column, line 29 - right-hand column, line 27 *