Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066216

EP1066216 - USE OF A MEMBRANE REACTOR FOR HYDROGEN PRODUCTION VIA THE DIRECT CRACKING OF HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.03.2002  [2002/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION
300 Erie Boulevard West Syracuse
New York 13202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION
300 Erie Boulevard West
Syracuse New York 13202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AMIRIDIS, Michael, D.
2622 Forest Drive
Columbia, SC 29204 / US
02 / ZHANG, Tiejun
1850 Ashley Crossing Lane
Charleston, SC 29414 / US
03 / BERNALES, Cicero, A.
5003 Saddlebrook Drive
Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Eastcheap House Central Approach
Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB
Application number, filing date99908260.519.02.1999
[2001/02]
WO1999US03574
Priority number, dateUS19980075814P24.02.1998         Original published format: US 75814 P
US1999023186214.01.1999         Original published format: US 231862
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943610
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066216
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2001/02]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/26, C01B3/50
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/02]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES MEMBRAN-REAKTORS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERSTOFF DURCH DIREKTES KRACKEN VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN[2001/02]
English:USE OF A MEMBRANE REACTOR FOR HYDROGEN PRODUCTION VIA THE DIRECT CRACKING OF HYDROCARBONS[2001/02]
French:UTILISATION D'UN REACTEUR A MEMBRANE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'HYDROGENE PAR CRAQUAGE DIRECT D'HYDROCARBURES[2001/02]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
29.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/11]
09.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4981676  (MINET RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 [Y] 11-12;
 [X]US5326550  (ADRIS ALAA-ELDIN M [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,8;
 [Y]US4244811  (GRENOBLE DANE C, et al) [Y] 11-12;
 [A]US5525322  (WILLMS R SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-12;
 [A]US5639431  (SHIRASAKI YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12;
 [A]US3962411  (SETZER HERBERT J, et al) [A] 7,8;
 [A]US5215729  (BUXBAUM ROBERT E [US]) [A] 4-5