EP0981388 - APHERESIS SYSTEM WITH ANTICOAGULANT FLOW CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMM, Daniel, J. 1318 Old Bay Road McHenry, IL 60050 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908459.3 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/09] | WO1999US04090 | Priority number, date | US19980042260 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: US 42260 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945995 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981388 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61M1/3672 (EP,US);
A61M1/3621 (EP);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/09] | Title | German: | APHERESESYSTEM MIT DURCHFLUSSKONTROLLE FÜR ANTIKOAGULANS | [2000/09] | English: | APHERESIS SYSTEM WITH ANTICOAGULANT FLOW CONTROL | [2000/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REALISER UNE APHERESE AVEC REGULATION DU FLUX D'ANTICOAGULANT | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 18.01.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4526515 (DEVRIES JAMES H [US]); | [Y]US5015226 (POLASCHEGG HANS-DIETRICH [DE]) |