Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986701

EP0986701 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ENERGY CONTENT OF A FUEL DELIVERED TO AN ENGINE BASED UPON EXHAUST GAS O 2? LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Scott, C. c/o CATERPILLAR INC.
100 NE Adams Street
Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US
02 / WILLI, Martin, L.
2419 Farmington Drive W.
Lafayette, IN 47905 / US
[2000/17]
Former [2000/12]01 / BROWN, Scott, C.
Graf Spee Strasse 36
D-24105 Kiel / DE
02 / WILLI, Martin, L.
2419 Farmington Drive W.
Lafayette, IN 47905 / US
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/12]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99908576.401.03.1999
[2000/12]
WO1999US04417
Priority number, dateUS1998003611106.03.1998         Original published format: US 36111
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9945257
Date:10.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986701
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986701
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/14
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   SE [2000/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DES ENERGIEGEHALTES EINES DEM MOTOR ZUGEFÜHRTEN BRENNSTOFFS BASIERT AUF DEN O2-GEHALT DES ABGASES[2000/12]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ENERGY CONTENT OF A FUEL DELIVERED TO AN ENGINE BASED UPON EXHAUST GAS O 2? LEVEL[2000/12]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA TENEUR EN ENERGIE D'UN CARBURANT INTRODUIT DANS UN MOTEUR SUR LA BASE DU NIVEAU D'OXYGENE DU GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT[2000/12]
Entry into regional phase10.11.1999National basic fee paid 
10.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
11.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2003Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2004Fee for grant paid
09.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2004
FR02.06.2004
SE02.09.2004
[2006/32]
Former [2005/11]AT02.06.2004
SE02.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE02.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5197450  (KITAJIMA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-13;
 [A]US5582157  (UCHIKAWA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-13;
 [A]US4986241  (INOUE RYUZABURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13
Examination US4138725