EP1058581 - SEALING APPARATUS FOR USE WITH MICROPLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIGLIN, Marc 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/50] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908596.2 | 01.03.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US04454 | Priority number, date | US19980076581P | 03.03.1998 Original published format: US 76581 P | GB19980013578 | 24.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9813578 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944742 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058581 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N31/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP);
B01L3/50825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Extension states | AL | 04.10.2000 | LT | 04.10.2000 | LV | 04.10.2000 | MK | 04.10.2000 | RO | 04.10.2000 | SI | 04.10.2000 | Title | German: | Dichtungsapparat zur Verwendung mit Mikroplatten | [2000/50] | English: | SEALING APPARATUS FOR USE WITH MICROPLATES | [2000/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC DES PLAQUES DE MICROTITRATION | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4780285 ; | [Y]US5618701 ; | [A]US4077845 ; | [A]US5346672 ; | [A]US5665247 ; | [A]US5721136 ; | [AP]US5759784 |