Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055152

EP1055152 - DEVICE FOR WIDE-ANGLE PROJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/48]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WIDE-ANGLE PROJECTION
[2001/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dataframe Vertrieb Audiovisueller Kommunikationssysteme GmbH
Boschstrasse 10
82178 Puchheim / DE
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / MAYR, Peter
Hauptstrasse 61
D-82140 Olching / DE
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Hano, Christian , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99908877.611.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999EP00897
Priority number, dateDE199810550711.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19805507
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941641
Date:19.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055152
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055152
Date:24.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/30]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03B37/00, G03B21/00
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WEITWINKELPROJEKTION[2001/04]
English:DEVICE FOR WIDE-ANGLE PROJECTION[2001/04]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR PROJECTION GRAND ANGLE[2001/04]
Former [2000/48]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WEITWINKELPROJEKTION
Former [2000/48]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WIDE-ANGLE PROJECTION
Former [2000/48]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PROJECTION GRAND ANGLE
Entry into regional phase24.08.2000National basic fee paid 
24.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
07.05.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
26.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2002Fee for grant paid
29.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR24.07.2002
GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
IT24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
AT11.02.2003
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FR24.07.2002
GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
AT11.02.2003
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
Former [2004/31]GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
AT11.02.2003
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
Former [2004/05]GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
Former [2004/02]GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
Former [2003/20]GB24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/17]GB24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/10]NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE24.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US4464029  (JAULMES PHILPPE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 6 - column 7; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5253116  (LACROIX MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 2 - column 3; figure 2 *