Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002505359 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1062259 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | B1 | EP1062259 | 27.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2324279 | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59907372D1 | 20.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0101019 | 28.11.2001 | A3 | HUP0101019 | 30.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6342300 | 29.01.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9901112 | 20.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9945054 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19809913 | 09.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809913 | 07.03.1998 |