Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1062259

EP1062259 - BIODEGRADABLE POLYMERS BASED ON NATURAL AND RENEWABLE RAW MATERIALS, ESPECIALLY ISOSORBITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Celanese Ventures GmbH
Industriepark Hoechst, Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Celanese Ventures GmbH
Industriepark Hoechst, Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Celanese Ventures GmbH
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Axiva GmbH
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BENGS, Holger
Bindingstrasse 3
D-60598 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / SCHÖNFELD, Axel
Dr.-Fritz-Gontermann-Strasse 10
D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE
03 / BÖHM, Gitte
Im Burgfeld 243
D-60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
04 / WEIS, Siegfried
Kurmainzerstrasse 32
D-65817 Eppstein / DE
05 / CLAUSS, Joachim
Ziegelhüttenweg 49
D-60598 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
Industriepark Höchst, Gebäude F 821
65926 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte Industriepark Höchst, Gebäude F 821
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2002/19]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte Industriepark Höchst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2000/52]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date99908935.220.02.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999EP01112
Priority number, dateDE199810991307.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19809913
[2000/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9945054
Date:10.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1062259
Date:27.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1062259
Date:15.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/42]
Search report(s)International search reportEP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/60
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/52]
TitleGerman:BIODEGRADABLE POLYMERE AUF DER BASIS VON NATÜRLICHEN UND NACHWACHSENDEN ROHSTOFFEN, INSBESONDERE ISOSORBIT[2000/52]
English:BIODEGRADABLE POLYMERS BASED ON NATURAL AND RENEWABLE RAW MATERIALS, ESPECIALLY ISOSORBITE[2000/52]
French:POLYMERES BIODEGRADABLES A BASE DE MATIERES BRUTES NATURELLES ET RENOUVELABLES, NOTAMMENT D'ISOSORBITOL[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2000National basic fee paid 
26.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
02.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2003Fee for grant paid
11.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT15.10.2003
ES26.01.2004
BE28.02.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/14]ES26.01.2004
BE28.02.2004
Former [2004/46]ES26.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0514790  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7,9-13 * example 5; claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0483606  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 5-8 * claim 4 *
 [Y]  - OKADA, MASAHIKO ET AL, "Biodegradable polymers based on renewable resources. II. Synthesis and biodegradability of polyesters containing furan rings", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19971103), vol. 127, no. 18, Database accession no. 248490, XP002103988 [Y] 1-4,8-13 * abstract *
    [] - J. POLYM. SCI., PART A: POLYM. CHEM. (1997), 35(13), 2729-2737 CODEN: JPACEC;ISSN: 0887-624X, (1997),
 [Y]  - OKADA, MASAHIKO ET AL, "Synthesis and biodegradability of polyesters based on 1,4:3,6-dianhydrohexitols and succinic acid derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951016), vol. 123, no. 16, Database accession no. 199994, XP002103989 [Y] 1-4,8-13 * abstract *
    [] - STUD. POLYM. SCI. (1994), 12(BIODEGRADABLE PLASTICS AND POLYMERS), 511-18 CODEN: SPLSEA;ISSN: 0922-5579, (1994),
 [Y]  - OKADA, MASAHIKO ET AL, "Synthesis and degradabilities of polyesters from 1,4:3,6-dianhydrohexitol and aliphatic dicarboxylic acids", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960226), vol. 124, no. 9, Database accession no. 117772, XP002103990 [Y] 1-4,8-13 * abstract *
    [] - J. POLYM. SCI., PART A: POLYM. CHEM. (1995), 33(16), 2813-20 CODEN: JPACEC;ISSN: 0887-624X, (1995),
 [Y]  - OKADA, MASAHIKO ET AL, "Biodegradable polymers based on renewable resources: polyesters composed of 1,4: 3,6-dianhydrohexitol and aliphatic dicarboxylic acid units", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970113), vol. 126, no. 2, Database accession no. 19395, XP002103991 [Y] 1-4,8-13 * abstract *
    [] - J. APPL. POLYM. SCI. (1996), 62(13), 2257-2265 CODEN: JAPNAB;ISSN: 0021-8995, (1996),