blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1064257

EP1064257 - ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / BOYLE, Francis Thomas
Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Tait, Brian Steele, et al
AstraZeneca, Global Intellectual Property Patents, P.O. Box 272, Mereside, Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Tait, Brian Steele, et al
AstraZeneca, Global Intellectual Property Patents, P.O. Box 272, Mereside, Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB
Application number, filing date99909098.816.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999GB00786
Priority number, dateGB1998000586820.03.1998         Original published format: GB 9805868
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9948860
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064257
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064257
Date:29.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07C235/78, A61K31/165
[2001/01]
CPC:
C07C235/78 (EP,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
Extension statesAL20.10.2000
LT20.10.2000
LV20.10.2000
MK20.10.2000
RO20.10.2000
SI20.10.2000
TitleGerman:ANTI-TUMOR-MITTEL[2001/01]
English:ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS[2001/01]
French:AGENTS ANTITUMORAUX[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2000National basic fee paid 
20.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2002Fee for grant paid
14.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0002677  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * example 26; claims 1,10 *;
 [AD]WO9311099  (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB]) [AD] 1,9,10 * page 9 - page 11; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]  - W. C. J. ROSS ET AL., "Aryl-2-halogenoalkylamines.", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY., LETCHWORTH GB, (1955), pages 3110 - 3116, XP002105519 [A] 1,9,10 * page 3112 *
 [AD]  - BRIDGET M. SYKES ET AL., "Kinetics and mechanism of the cyclization of substituted n-phenyl-2-methyl-2-(2-aminophenyl)propanamides and analogues", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2., LETCHWORTH GB, (1995), pages 337 - 342, XP002105520 [AD] 1,9,10 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - LOUIS A. CARPINO ET AL., "Reductive lactonization of strategically methylated quinone propionic acid esters and amides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19890707), vol. 54, no. 14, pages 3303 - 3310, XP002105524 [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00275a012
 [AD]  - CHIKHALE P ET AL, "TUMOR TARGETED PRODRUGS: REDOX-ACTIVATION OF CONFORMATIONALLY CONSTRAINED, BIOREDUCTIVE MELPHALAN PRODRUGS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 88TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, SAN DIEGO, APR. 12 - 16, 1997, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, (19970412), no. VOL.38, page 432, XP002052354 [AD] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.