blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1018213 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1018213



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 99
05.09.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
22.01.2002 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.01.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.05.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 4
08.05.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2000 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.03.2000 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
28.10.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.10.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34