blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1018213


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.10.2002  [2002/43]
31.05.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
22.05.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
04.01.2002 First examination report
03.01.2002 Examination report or reply
15.05.2001 Renewal fee
26.05.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
26.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
25.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication