blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1018213
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002504296Global Dossier 05.02.2002A
Priority number Date
IB9900571 01.04.1999
EP98201085 09.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1018213Global Dossier 12.07.2000A2
Priority number Date
IB9900571 01.04.1999
EP98201085 09.04.1998
EP99909142 01.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9953609Global Dossier 13.01.2000A3
WO9953609 21.10.1999A2
Priority number Date
EP98201085 09.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20010013516 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98201085 09.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6107894 22.08.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98201085 09.04.1998