Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018213

EP1018213 - COUPLED SAWTOOTH OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN TUIJL, Adrianus, J., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / GIERKINK, Sander, L., J.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99909142.401.04.1999
[2000/28]
WO1999IB00571
Priority number, dateEP1998020108509.04.1998         Original published format: EP 98201085
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9953609
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018213
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03B5/24, H03K3/354
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/28]
TitleGerman:GEKOPPELTER SÄGEZAHNOSZILLATOR[2000/28]
English:COUPLED SAWTOOTH OSCILLATOR[2000/28]
French:OSCILLATEUR DE DENTS DE SCIE COUPLE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
08.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
19.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/43]
27.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5654677  (DENT PAUL W [SE])
 [A]  - MICHAEL P. FLYNN ET AL, "A 1.2-mum CMOS Current-Controlled Oscillator", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (1992), vol. 27, no. 7,