EP1098509 - FACSIMILE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seconet Co., Ltd. 9F Bojung Building, 158-2, Sukchon-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-190 / KR | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Masato SC2 Co., Ltd. Higashikanda Bldg. 4F 1-7-8, Higashikanda Chiyoda Tokyo 101-0031 / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 99909240.6 | 18.03.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999JP01368 | Priority number, date | JP19980090731 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: JP 9073198 | JP19980120115 | 14.04.1998 Original published format: JP 12011598 | JP19980212016 | 13.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21201698 | [2001/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948279 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098509 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/44 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H04N1/44 (EP,KR);
H04N1/444 (EP);
H04N1/4446 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IT [2001/19] | Title | German: | FAXGERÄT | [2001/19] | English: | FACSIMILE MACHINE | [2001/19] | French: | TELECOPIEUR | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2000 | Translation filed | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1075325 (S C TSUU KK); | [A]JPH09149266 (S C TSUU KK) |