Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069600

EP1069600 - ILLUMINATOR, EXPOSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.10.2006  [2006/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building
2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOMATSUDA, Hideki, Nikon Corporation
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
02 / KANAYAMAYA, Nobumichi, Nikon Corporation
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
03 / TANITSU, Osamu, Nikon Corporation
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
04 / SHIBUYA, Masato, Nikon Corporation
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99909301.623.03.1999
[2001/03]
WO1999JP01442
Priority number, dateJP1998009385824.03.1998         Original published format: JP 9385898
JP1998018810019.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18810098
JP1999000393211.01.1999         Original published format: JP 393299
[2001/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9949505
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1069600
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2001/03]
Search report(s)International search reportJP30.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/027, G03F7/20
[2001/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
TitleGerman:BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2001/03]
English:ILLUMINATOR, EXPOSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD[2001/03]
French:ILLUMINATEUR, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT DISPOSITIF[2001/03]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2000Translation filed 
18.10.2000National basic fee paid 
18.10.2000Search fee paid 
18.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
19.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/42]
01.06.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0576297  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,8,55,57-60,65,81,84 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1-4 *
International search[XE]JPH1197340  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO);
 [A]JPH1050599  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK);
 [A]JPH0945607  (CANON KK)