Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1062838

EP1062838 - DIRECTIONAL MICROPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ULLMAN, Johan
Johannesbergsgatan 30
S-412 55 Göteborg / SE
[2000/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Hammond, Andrew David
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Hammond, Andrew David
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2000/52]Hammond, Andrew David
Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB, Sjöporten 4
417 64 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date99909462.612.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999SE00390
Priority number, dateSE1998000085012.03.1998         Original published format: SE 9800850
[2000/52]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9949697
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1062838
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2000/52]
Search report(s)International search reportSE30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/34, // H04M1:19
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:RICHTMIKROFON[2000/52]
English:DIRECTIONAL MICROPHONE[2000/52]
French:MICROPHONE DIRECTIONNEL[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase12.03.1999Translation filed 
02.10.2000National basic fee paid 
02.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
06.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/43]
21.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP59037797  ;
 [Y]GB2027318  (FARMER N);
 [Y]US5692060  (WICKSTROM TIMOTHY K [US]);
 [Y]US4967874  (SCALLI JEFFREY R [US]);
 [Y]DE3901158  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]);
 [Y]US4555598  (FLANAGAN JAMES L [US], et al);
 [Y]JP57037997  ;
 [Y]US5313514  (KANASASHI HISANORI [JP])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 59037797 A (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 1 March 1984.,
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP 57037997 A (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 2 March 1982.,