Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090538

EP1090538 - SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY COMPATIBLE EMI GASKET AND A METHOD OF INSTALLING AN EMI GASKET ON A GROUND TRACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206
Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206
Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206
Newark, DE 19714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REIS, Bradley, E.
23 Woodward Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
02 / KING, David, R.
150 King William Street
Newark, DE 19711 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/33]Shanks, Andrew
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Former [2001/15]McCallum, William Potter
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date99909514.419.02.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999US03577
Priority number, dateUS1998005208031.03.1998         Original published format: US 52080
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951074
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1090538
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1090538
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K9/00, H05K3/40
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
Extension statesRO27.10.2000
TitleGerman:DICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHIRMUNG VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN INTERFERENZEN, DIE MIT DER OBERFLÄCHENMONTAGETECHNOLOGIE KOMPATIBEL IST, UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DIESER DICHTUNG AM GRUNDRISS[2001/15]
English:SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY COMPATIBLE EMI GASKET AND A METHOD OF INSTALLING AN EMI GASKET ON A GROUND TRACE[2001/15]
French:JOINT ANTI-PARASITES COMPATIBLE AVEC LA TECHNOLOGIE DU MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE CE JOINT SUR UNE COUCHE SUPPORT[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2001National basic fee paid 
04.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.01.2001Examination requested  [2002/33]
10.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2003Fee for grant paid
03.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.12.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000CY   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
20.12.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.12.2000M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.06.2003
CY04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
LU19.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2007/22]
Former [2005/23]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
LU19.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/02]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5524908  (REIS BRADLEY E [US]) [Y] 1-4,8,11,12 * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 17 * * column 4, line 41 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 27 - column 5, line 29 * * column 5, line 58 - column 5, line 62 * * column 7, line 13 - column 7, line 16 * * column 7, line 55 - column 7, line 57 * * column 8, line 46 - column 8, line 49 *;
 [Y]WO9741716  (KAUHANIEMI JARI [FI], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,11,12 * page 2, line 33 - page 2, line 34 * * page 5, line 13 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 20 - page 6, line 23 * * page 6, line 28 - page 6, line 32; figures 3A-3D *;
 [A]GB2218264  (RFI SHIELDING LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,3,7,10 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 1; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0594041  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,12 *see the whole document*;
 [A]US5150282  (TOMURA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *