Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056374

EP1056374 - VEHICLE MOUNTED OPTICAL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITERIS, INC.
1515 South Manchester Avenue
Anaheim, California 92802 / US
[2000/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Hugh
3370 Miraloma Avenue
Anaheim, CA 92803 / US
02 / COLEMAN, Jeffrey, R.
2414 North French Street
Santa Ana, CA 92706 / US
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Fiener, Josef
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [2000/49]Fiener, Josef
Postfach 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date99909674.626.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999US04364
Priority number, dateUS1998003866627.02.1998         Original published format: US 38666
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943242
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056374
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/49]
Search report(s)International search reportUS02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47F7/14
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:AUF EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG MONTIERTE OPTISCHE ANORDNUNG[2000/49]
English:VEHICLE MOUNTED OPTICAL ASSEMBLY[2000/49]
French:ENSEMBLE OPTIQUE MONTE SUR UN VEHICULE[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2000National basic fee paid 
21.09.2000Search fee paid 
21.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
15.10.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US5485378  (FRANKE UWE [DE], et al);
 [A]US5667176  (ZAMARRIPA MICHAEL P [US], et al);
 [A]US4576320  (MEAD F JEROME [US]);
 [A]US3343772  (HOWELL THOMAS G, et al);
 [A]US5743991  (TEDER REIN S [US], et al);
 [A]US4863130  (MARKS JR FRANKLIN J [US])
by applicantUS5485378