Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057116

EP1057116 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GAP COVERAGE IN STREAMING PROTOCOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196-3750 / US
[2000/49]
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKHART, Thomas, Wayne
4580 Maple Crescent
Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 4B4 / CA
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola European IP Operations
Midpoint
Alencon Link
Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date99909881.705.03.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999US04928
Priority number, dateUS1998005385102.04.1998         Original published format: US 53851
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9952238
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1057116
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2000/49]
Search report(s)International search reportUS05.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, G06F19/00, H04L29/06
[2003/32]
Former International [2000/49]G06F15/16, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPALTABDECKUNG IN DATENSTRÖMUNGSPROTOKOLLEN[2000/49]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GAP COVERAGE IN STREAMING PROTOCOLS[2000/49]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COUVERTURE DES INTERVALLES DANS LES PROTOCOLES DE TRANSMISSION EN CONTINU[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Search fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
27.08.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9707656  (BACKWEB [IL]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 35; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0798934  (BRODERBUND SOFTWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 17 - line 33; claim 7 *
International search[YP]US5737619  (JUDSON DAVID HUGH [US])