Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009931

EP1009931 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / YUAN, Bo
Forststrasse 57
D-76131 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / DANTES, Günter
Karlstrasse 20
D-71735 Eberdingen / DE
03 / HEYSE, Jörg
Eichenweg 15
D-71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2000/25]
Application number, filing date99910101.705.02.1999
[2000/25]
WO1999DE00300
Priority number, dateDE199812289622.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19822896
[2000/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961787
Date:02.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009931
Date:21.06.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009931
Date:14.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/03]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02M61/18
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/25]
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL[2000/25]
English:FUEL INJECTION VALVE[2000/25]
French:SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2000National basic fee paid 
22.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
21.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2003Fee for grant paid
14.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DX]DE4446241  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-3,7,10 * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 51; figures 1-3,6-9 *;
 [DX]GB201556  (ATLAS DIESEL AB) [DX] 1-3 * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE19639506  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 7,8,11 * abstract *
by applicantDE19639506
 GB201556
 DE4123692
 DE4446241
 DE19527626