Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051372

EP1051372 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING ORGANIC WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lurgi Energie und Entsorgung GmbH
Berliner Strasse 93
40880 Ratingen / DE
[2001/36]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Lurgi Entsorgung GmbH
Lurgiallee 5
60439 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VOLLMER, Friedel
Lessingstrasse 16
D-44652 Herne / DE
02 / DOLLE, Lothar
Mont-Cenis-Strasse 164
D-44627 Herne / DE
03 / LISTRINGHAUS, Walter
Heckengasse 11
D-58809 Neuenrade / DE
04 / PLATEN, Elmar
Josef-Kothes-Strasse 32
D-40670 Meerbusch-Strümp / DE
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Vomberg, Friedhelm
Schulstrasse 8
42653 Solingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys.
Schulstrasse 8
42653 Solingen / DE
Application number, filing date99910114.003.02.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999DE00333
Priority number, dateDE199810494907.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804949
[2000/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940045
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051372
Date:15.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051372
Date:02.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C05F17/00, C05F17/02
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TROCKNUNG VON ORGANISCHEN ABFÄLLEN[2000/46]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING ORGANIC WASTE[2000/46]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SECHER DES DECHETS ORGANIQUES[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2001Fee for grant paid
22.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.05.2002
FR02.05.2002
GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
IT02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
AT03.02.2003
CY03.02.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FI02.05.2002
FR02.05.2002
GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
AT03.02.2003
CY03.02.2003
Former [2004/44]FI02.05.2002
GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
FR10.01.2003
AT03.02.2003
CY03.02.2003
Former [2004/40]FI02.05.2002
GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
FR10.01.2003
AT03.02.2003
Former [2004/31]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
FR10.01.2003
AT03.02.2003
Former [2004/05]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
ES28.11.2002
FR10.01.2003
Former [2003/47]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
FR10.01.2003
Former [2003/46]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2003/21]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
PT02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2003/20]GB02.05.2002
GR02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2003/17]GB02.05.2002
IE02.05.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2002/46]SE02.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE19547062  (ML ENTSORGUNGS UND ENERGIEANLA [DE]) [Y] 1,6-24 * claim - * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 65 *;
 [Y]EP0623572  (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [Y] 1,6-24 * claim - * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9607624  (BJERAGER PER EDUARD ROBERT [DK]) [A] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0691316  (ML ENTSORGUNGS UND ENERGIEANLA [DE]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *