Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1060488

EP1060488 - METAL-PLATING FOR SELF-HEALING FOIL CAPACITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/33]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VETTER, Harald
Wichernweg 5
D-89520 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Epping, Wilhelm , et al
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26
80034 München / DE
Application number, filing date99910121.510.02.1999
[2000/51]
WO1999DE00363
Priority number, dateDE199810658617.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19806586
[2000/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943011
Date:26.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1060488
Date:20.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1060488
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search reportEP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01G4/015, H01G4/008
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [2000/51]
TitleGerman:METALLISIERUNG FÜR SELBSTHEILENDEN FOLIENKONDENSATOR[2000/51]
English:METAL-PLATING FOR SELF-HEALING FOIL CAPACITORS[2000/51]
French:REVETEMENT METALLIQUE POUR CONDENSATEUR BOBINE AUTOREGENERABLE[2000/51]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2000National basic fee paid 
28.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
09.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2002Fee for grant paid
12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT10.02.2003
BE28.02.2003
ES28.03.2003
[2007/22]
Former [2004/31]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT10.02.2003
BE28.02.2003
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/28]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
BE28.02.2003
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/05]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/42]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[PXY]DE19639877  (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [PX] 1,3,4,7-10 * column 1, line 57 - line 68 * * column 2, line 10 - line 59 * * column 4, line 23 - line 36 * * figures 1,2 * * claims 4,10 * [PY] 2,5,6;
 [YA]EP0640996  (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [Y] 2,5,6 * figures 1-3,9 * [A] 3;
 [A]FR2605140  (PRELYO CONDENSATEUR [FR]) [A] 4 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 5 - line 10 *;
 [A]EP0088137  (STEINER KG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *