EP1066642 - METHOD FOR MAKING A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL CONTAINING A DYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIDDELMAN, Erik Akzo Nobel N.V. Intel. Prop. Dept. (Dept. AIP) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 02 /
SCHROPP, Rudolf, Emmanuel, Isidore Akzo Nobel N.V. Intel. Prop. Dept. (Dept. AIP) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 03 /
SALAFSKY, Joshua, Samuel Akzo Nobel N.V. Intel. Prop. Dept. (Dept. AIP) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2001/02] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V., Intellectual Property Department (Dept. AIP), P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 99910370.8 | 19.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999EP01898 | Priority number, date | EP19980200940 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: EP 98200940 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949483 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066642 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066642 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/00, H01G9/20 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H10K71/00 (EP,US);
H01G9/20 (KR);
H01M14/00 (KR);
H10K71/13 (EP,US);
H01G9/2004 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
H10K71/50 (EP,US);
H10K71/80 (EP,US);
H10K85/344 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER EINEN FARBSTOFF ENTHALTENDEN SOLARZELLE | [2001/02] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL CONTAINING A DYE | [2001/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE CONTENANT UN COLORANT | [2003/05] |
Former [2001/02] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CELLULE PHOTOVOLTA QUE CONTENANT UN COLORANT | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.08.2003 | DK | 27.11.2003 | GR | 27.11.2003 | IE | 19.03.2004 | LU | 19.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/19] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]JPH01119072 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [DY] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0739020 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [DYA]WO9715959 (SONCEBOZ EBAUCHES FAB [CH], et al) [DY] 1-7 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 31 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 17 * * page 9, line 1 - line 7; figures 1,3 * [A] 11,12; | [A] - KAY A ET AL, "LOW COST PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES BASED ON DYE SENSITIZED NANOCRYSTALLINE TITANIUM DIOXIDE AND CARBON POWDER", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, (19961030), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 99 - 117, XP000627698 [A] 1-10 * page 109, line 38 - page 111, line 15; figures 2,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0927-0248(96)00063-3 |