EP1163821 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING CONNECTIONS ON MULTIPOINT-TO-POINT TOPOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÄÄNÄNEN, Pasi Apartment 25, 25 Linden Avenue Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 02 /
SOIRINSUO, Timo 77 Sacramento Street 7 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2006/27] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri Espatent Oy Tekniikantie 14 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2004/02] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri Forssén & Salomaa Oy Eerikinkatu 2 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/05] | Stellberg, Hans Valter, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Eerikinkatu 2 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2001/51] | Johansson, Folke Anders Nokia Corporation P.O. Box 206 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 99910391.4 | 17.03.1999 | [2001/51] | WO1999FI00200 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056115 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163821 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04L2012/5643 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN BEI MEHRPUNKT-ZU-PUNKT-TOPOLOGIEN | [2001/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING CONNECTIONS ON MULTIPOINT-TO-POINT TOPOLOGIES | [2001/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ETABLISSEMENT DE CONNEXIONS DANS DES TOPOLOGIES MULTIPOINT-A-POINT | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2320159 ; | [Y]US5557609 ; | [A]US5634097 |