EP1062097 - LIQUID DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegedus, György Wesselényi u. 4 1075 Budapest / HU | For all designated states Kocsis, Albert 532 utca 7 1173 Budapest / HU | For all designated states Florian, Gusztav Kalman u. 96 2120 Dunakeszi / HU | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Bokor, Tamas S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices Andrassy ut 113. 1062 Budapest / HU | [2003/16] |
Former [2000/52] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910568.7 | 02.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999HU00015 | Priority number, date | HU19980000508 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: HU 9800508 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946126 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062097 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062097 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/135, B41J2/025 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B41J2/04 (EP,US);
B05B17/0607 (US);
B05B17/0623 (EP);
B41J2/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Extension states | LT | 18.08.2000 | LV | 18.08.2000 | RO | 18.08.2000 | SI | 18.08.2000 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/52] | English: | LIQUID DISPENSING APPARATUS | [2000/52] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR DE LIQUIDE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.05.2003 | FI | 14.05.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | GR | 14.08.2003 | PT | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/23] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 14.08.2003 | |
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07314665 ; | [X]US3667678 (HASKELL JOHN W) [X] 1,2,5-7,12,17,19 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2024724 (DENNISON MFG CO) [X] 1,2,4,10,12,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4229748 (WILLIAMS TED F, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0026688 (IMAJE SA [FR]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4349830 (RUDD III ROBERT E) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [X]US4390484 (LOMBARDO IGINO, et al) [X] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4583101 (BRAUN HILARION [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0285794 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9631289 (FLUID PROPULSION TECHN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,19 * page 11, line 36 - page 29, line 4; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07314665 A 19951205 (CANON INC) [X] 1,4,12 * abstract * | by applicant | US3653598 | US4815661 | US4897673 |