Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990170

EP0990170 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMAGING AN OBJECT BY MEANS OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.03.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HASELHOFF, Eltjo, H.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / DE BECKER, Jan, F., L.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99910596.808.04.1999
[2000/14]
WO1999IB00610
Priority number, dateEP1998020126417.04.1998         Original published format: EP 98201264
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954750
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990170
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/54
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abbildung eines Objektes mittels Magnetischen Resonanz.[2000/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMAGING AN OBJECT BY MEANS OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE D'UN OBJET PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
11.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/15]
23.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]US5323111  (SUZUKI KATSUNORI [JP]);
 [A]US5719498  (HAUSMANN RICHARD [DE]);
 [A]US5514962  (CLINE HARVEY E [US], et al);
 [A]US4674046  (OZEKI TAKESHI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0487201  (PICKER INT INC [US])