Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072770

EP1072770 - INCLINED SINGLE CYLINDER ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO. LTD.
1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
Yanmar Diesel Engine Co. Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Takehiro, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0013 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Nobuhiro, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0013 / JP
03 / IWATA, Satoshi, Yanmar Diesel Engine Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0013 / JP
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99910748.526.03.1999
[2001/05]
WO1999JP01595
Priority number, dateJP1998010632116.04.1998         Original published format: JP 10632198
JP1998012337806.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12337898
JP1998013908621.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13908698
JP1998013954621.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13954698
[2001/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954608
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1072770
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2001/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02B75/26, F02B77/00
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2001/05]
TitleGerman:GENEIGTER EINZYLINDERMOTOR[2001/05]
English:INCLINED SINGLE CYLINDER ENGINE[2001/05]
French:MOTEUR MONOCYLINDRIQUE INCLINE[2001/05]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2000Translation filed 
30.10.2000National basic fee paid 
30.10.2000Search fee paid 
30.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
30.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/17]
11.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS60179383  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS59201923  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]JPH02212641  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0484731U  ;
 [A]JPS6026348U  ;
 [A]JPH02163409  (KUBOTA LTD)
by applicantJPH0545876U
 JPS572209U