Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1060318

EP1060318 - DISPLAY CASE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anthony, Inc.
12812 Arroyo Street
San Fernando, California 91342 / US
[2000/51]
Inventor(s)01 / RICHARDSON, Richard, J.
1169 Nonchalant Drive
Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US
02 / CROWN, Charles, E.
Apartment 1, 13233 Maclay Street
San Fernando, CA 91340 / US
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]Howden, Christopher Andrew , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99911138.803.03.1999
[2000/51]
WO1999US04855
Priority number, dateUS1998003454803.03.1998         Original published format: US 34548
[2000/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9945331
Date:10.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1060318
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999
[2000/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.04.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:E06B1/04, E06B1/32, E06B1/38, E06B3/00, B21D35/00, A47F3/04
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/51]E06B1/04, E06B1/32, E06B1/38, E06B3/00, B21D35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/51]
TitleGerman:VITRINENTÜR[2000/51]
English:DISPLAY CASE DOOR[2000/51]
French:PORTE DE VITRINE[2000/51]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2000National basic fee paid 
19.09.2000Search fee paid 
01.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0271786  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,14,17,21 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *
International search[Y]US5113628  (RICHARDSON RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [Y]US4753043  (BOCKWINKEL GERALD J [US]);
 [Y]US3843982  (LANE M, et al);
 [Y]US5363611  (RICHARDSON RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5111618  (KASPAR MELVIN [US], et al);
 [A]US3499245  (WINSLER ROBERT J, et al);
 [A]US4004370  (HEANEY JAMES J);
 [X]US4741127  (BOCKWINKEL GERALD J [US]);
 [A]US4831780  (BOCKWINKEL GERALD J [US]);
 [A]US4852303  (ROLEK MATTHEW [US]);
 [A]US4998382  (KOSTOS JEFFERY [US], et al);
 [A]US5024023  (KOSTOS JEFFERY [US], et al);
 [A]US5097642  (RICHARDSON RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]US5228240  (BARROERO LOUIS [US], et al);
 [A]US5255473  (KASPAR MELVIN [US], et al);
 [A]US5544454  (RICHARDSON RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [AE]US5910083  (RICHARDSON RICHARD JAMES [US], et al)