Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063892

EP1063892 - DOUGH BALL LOADER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lawrence Equipment
2034 North Peck Road
South El Monte, CA 91733 / US
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LAWRENCE, Eric, Clay
2034 North Peck Road
South El Monte, CA 91733 / US
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
Former [2003/40]Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Leopold Street
Sheffield S1 2QD / GB
Former [2001/01]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99911230.309.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999US05106
Priority number, dateUS1998004452019.03.1998         Original published format: US 44520
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9946995
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1063892
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1063892
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A21C9/08, A21C11/00
[2001/34]
Former International [2001/01]A21C9/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR TEIGBÄLLE[2001/01]
English:DOUGH BALL LOADER[2001/01]
French:CHARGEUR DE BOULES DE PATE[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2000National basic fee paid 
18.10.2000Search fee paid 
18.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
10.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200305   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
IT02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
PT02.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/11]AT02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
Former [2004/51]CH02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US4996913  (DECHRISTOPHER EUGENE L [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 53 - line 68; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0533975  (BARILLA FLLI G & R [IT]) [A] 1-5 * figure 6 *;
 [DA]USRE34530E  (KIRKPATRICK JOHN W [US]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4838153  (ESCAMILLA ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4241648  (LONGENECKER JOHN G [US]) [A] 9 * figure - *
International search[Y]USRE34530E  (KIRKPATRICK JOHN W [US]);
 [Y]US5252055  (MANGIAVACCA NICOLA [IT]);
 [A]US2478676  (TEMPLE SR JOHN C);
 [A]US4668524  (KIRKPATRICK JOHN W [US]);
 [A]US5231919  (LAWRENCE ERIC C [US], et al)
by applicantUSRE34530E