blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1062826

EP1062826 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROUTING POSITIONING REQUESTS BASED ON MOBILE SWITCHING CENTER ADDRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive
P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roel Ng, Maya
1604 Chester Drive
Plano, TX 75025 / US
02 / Hayes, Stephen
2104 Via Madonna
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
03 / Havinis, Theodore
4407 Striped Maple Court
Concord, CA 94521 / US
 [2002/44]
Former [2001/05]01 / ROEL-NG, Maya
1604 Chester Drive
Plano, TX 75025 / US
02 / HAYES, Stephen
2104 Via Madonna
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
03 / HAVINIS, Theodore
4407 Striped Maple Court
Concord, CA94521 / US
Former [2000/52]01 / ROEL-NG, Maya
1604 Chester Drive
Plano, TX 75025 / US
02 / HAYES, Stephen
2104 Via Madonna
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
03 / HAVINIS, Theodore
1520 Preston Road 427
Plano, TX 75093 / US
Representative(s)Frank, Veit Peter, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/27]Frank, Veit Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2001/16]Wennerholm, Kristian, et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/12]Wennerholm, Kristian, et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/52]Norin, Klas, et al
ERICSSON RADIO SYSTEMS AB Common Patent Department
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99911255.008.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999US05159
Priority number, dateUS1998003676309.03.1998         Original published format: US 36763
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9946948
Date:16.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1062826
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1062826
Date:26.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/52]
CPC:
H04W8/10 (EP,US); H04W12/02 (EP); H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W12/08 (EP,US); H04W12/63 (EP,US); H04W12/72 (EP);
H04W8/16 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2000/52]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ROUTEN VON POSITIONIERUNGSANFORDERUNGEN BASIEREND AUF DIE ADRESSE VON MOBILVERMITTLUNGSANLAGE[2001/22]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROUTING POSITIONING REQUESTS BASED ON MOBILE SWITCHING CENTER ADDRESS[2000/52]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ACHEMINEMENT DE DEMANDES DE POSITIONNEMENT SUR LA BASE D'UNE ADRESSE DE CENTRE DE COMMUTATION MOBILE[2000/52]
Former [2000/52]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEITWEGLENKUNG VON POSITIONIERUNGSANFORDERUNGEN BASIEREND AUF DIE ADRESSE VON MOBILVERMITTLUNGSANLAGE
Entry into regional phase22.08.2000National basic fee paid 
22.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
30.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
18.04.2002Fee for grant paid
18.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination25.07.2002Appeal received No.  T1187/02
16.07.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible
Opposition(s)27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25]
Request for further processing for:18.04.2002Request for further processing filed
18.04.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9800988  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1,13 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 21 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 35 * * page 15, line 26 - page 17, line 19 *;
 [PX]WO9851104  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1-5,7,11-17,19,23,24 * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 25 ** page 11, line 25 - page 14, line 12 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.