Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069907

EP1069907 - DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ULCERATIVE COLITIS, AND CLINICAL SUBTYPES THEREOF, USING MICROBIAL UC pANCA ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, GR, IE, IT, LI
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/32]For all designated states
The Regents of The University of California
12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRAUN, Jonathan
3924 Hilton Head Way
Tarzana, CA 91356 / US
02 / COHAVY, Offer
3333 Stewart Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99911375.612.03.1999
[2001/04]
WO1999US05492
Priority number, dateUS1998004188912.03.1998         Original published format: US 41889
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9945955
Date:16.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1069907
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069907
Date:05.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/385, C12Q1/18, G01N33/564, G01N33/569
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/04]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSE, VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ULCERATIVER COLITIS UND DEREN SUBTYPEN UNTER VERWENDUNG MIKROBIELLER UC pANCA ANTIGENE[2001/04]
English:DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ULCERATIVE COLITIS, AND CLINICAL SUBTYPES THEREOF, USING MICROBIAL UC pANCA ANTIGENS[2001/04]
French:DIAGNOSTIC, PREVENTION ET TRAITEMENT DE LA RECTO-COLITE HEMORRAGIQUE ET DE SES SOUS-TYPES CLINIQUES A L'AIDE D'ANTIGENES MICROBIENS DES UC pANCA[2001/04]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2000National basic fee paid 
26.09.2000Search fee paid 
26.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2009Fee for grant paid
05.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
16.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200709   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.08.2009
BE05.08.2009
DK05.08.2009
FI05.08.2009
IT05.08.2009
NL05.08.2009
SE05.08.2009
GR06.11.2009
ES16.11.2009
PT05.12.2009
IE12.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT05.08.2009
BE05.08.2009
DK05.08.2009
FI05.08.2009
NL05.08.2009
SE05.08.2009
ES16.11.2009
PT05.12.2009
Former [2010/19]AT05.08.2009
FI05.08.2009
NL05.08.2009
SE05.08.2009
ES16.11.2009
PT05.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[PX]  - TARGAN S R, "The search for pathogenic antigens in ulcerative colitis.", GASTROENTEROLOGY. UNITED STATES MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 114, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1099 - 1100, XP002213620 [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(98)70331-2
International search[X]WO9738713  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al);
 [X]  - EGGENA M P, ET AL., "HISTONE H1: THE ULCERATIVE COLITIS SPECIFIC PANCA TARGET ANTIGEN", The FASEB Journal, Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology, US, US, (19960430), vol. 10, no. 06, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1079, XP002919043
 [XP]  - COHAVY O, ET AL., "IDENTIFICATION OF CANDIDATE BACTERIAL PATHOGENS IN ULCERATIVE COLI-TIS USING A DISEASE-SPECIFIC MARKER ANTIBODY", The FASEB Journal, Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology, US, US, (19980317), vol. 12, no. 04, ISSN 0892-6638, page A593, XP002919044
 [Y]  - SARTOR R. B., "PATHOGENESIS AND IMMUNE MECHANISMS OF CHRONIC INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC., US, US, (19970101), vol. 92., no. 12., ISSN 0002-9270, pages 05S - 11S., XP002919045