Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976164

EP0976164 - METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL CONTROL OF PIEZOELECTRIC OR ELECTROSTRICTIVE ACTUATORS IN DRIVE MECHANISMS FOR STEP-BY-STEP MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2004New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zrenner, Artur
Einhardstrasse 1
33098 Paderborn / DE
For all designated states
Sizmann, Richard
Unnützstrasse 2b
81825 München / DE
[2004/16]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Zrenner, Artur
Nadistrasse 6
80809 München / DE
For all designated states
Sizmann, Richard
Unnützstrasse 2b
81825 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZRENNER, Artur
Nadistrasse 6
D-80809 München / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99911599.113.02.1999
[2000/05]
WO1999DE00411
Priority number, dateDE199810612714.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19806127
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941791
Date:19.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976164
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/04, H01L41/09
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN ANSTEUERUNG VON PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN ODER ELEKTROSTRIKTIVEN AKTUATOREN IN ANTRIEBEN FÜR EINE SCHRITTWEISE BEWEGUNG[2000/05]
English:METHOD FOR ELECTRICAL CONTROL OF PIEZOELECTRIC OR ELECTROSTRICTIVE ACTUATORS IN DRIVE MECHANISMS FOR STEP-BY-STEP MOTION[2000/05]
French:PROCEDES DE COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE D'ACTIONNEURS PIEZO-ELECTRIQUES OU ELECTROSTRICTIFS DANS DES MECANISMES D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR MOUVEMENT PAS A PAS[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Public notificationsEXAMINATION REPORT UNDER ART. 96(2) EPC DATED 17-09-2003
Zrenner, Artur
Nadistrasse 6
80809 München / DE
[2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE19644550  (ZRENNER ARTUR DR [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *