Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1012239 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1012239



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 400
15.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.10.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.10.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
09.04.2009 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
16.12.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.08.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.08.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
01.08.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
01.08.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
25.04.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 4
02.04.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.04.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.02.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
04.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
04.02.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.12.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
30.11.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
08.10.2007 Annex to a communication Appeal 15
08.10.2007 Annex to a communication Appeal 4
08.10.2007 Annex to a communication Appeal 3
08.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.10.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.09.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.09.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
08.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
08.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
29.08.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 7
23.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 9
23.08.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 7
20.08.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.08.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.08.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
10.08.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.07.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.07.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.06.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
25.04.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.03.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
17.01.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.01.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.01.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
21.11.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.11.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
08.09.2006 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
10.08.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 3
10.08.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
10.06.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 6
10.06.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
22.05.2006 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
11.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
11.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
08.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
27.04.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
27.04.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
22.03.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.03.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
06.03.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 17
02.03.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.2006 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
30.11.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.11.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
27.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.08.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
12.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
12.08.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
12.08.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
16.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.04.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.04.2005 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
12.04.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
12.04.2005 Means of redress Search / examination 1
04.03.2005 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
13.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.03.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
31.03.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.03.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
28.02.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
28.10.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.10.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.10.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
12.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 5
12.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 14
12.05.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
12.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3