Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989932

EP0989932 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SANDWICH-TYPE COMPOSITE PANEL WITH ARTICULATION HINGE, AND RESULTING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PEGUFORM FRANCE
ZI Vernon St. Marcel
27950 Saint Marcel / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / HOCHET, Nicolas
Château de la Lorie
F-49500 La Chapelle sur Oudon / FR
02 / VENDANGEOT, Francis
9, rue des Déportés Résistants
F-44110 Châteaubriant / FR
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Le Forestier, Eric , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Le Forestier, Eric , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99911900.108.04.1999
[2000/14]
WO1999FR00811
Priority number, dateFR1998000455610.04.1998         Original published format: FR 9804556
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952702
Date:21.10.1999
Language:FR
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989932
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989932
Date:28.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/08, B29C53/06, B29D24/00, E05D1/02
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SANDWICHVERBUNDPLATTE MIT EINEM SCHARNIERGELENK UND SO HERGESTELLTE PLATTE[2000/14]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SANDWICH-TYPE COMPOSITE PANEL WITH ARTICULATION HINGE, AND RESULTING PANEL[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN PANNEAU COMPOSITE DU TYPE SANDWICH AVEC UNE CHARNIERE D'ARTICULATION, ET PANNEAU OBTENU PAR UN TEL PROCEDE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
16.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2003Fee for grant paid
10.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH0781628  ;
 [Y]JPH0781628  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,6,10-15 * figure - *;
 [Y]DE4442767  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,6,10-15 * the whole document *;
 [DA]FR2711573  (MANDUCHER SA [FR]) [DA] 10-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9316868  (HEXACOMB CORP [US]) [A] 1,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * page 3, line 15 - line 25 *;
 [A]US5132156  (TRASSARE JR ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 22; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]GB2061871  (CORNER E R E) [A] 1 * page 2, line 59 - line 83 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19612127  (MARGAUX AG [CH]) [A] 7,15 * column 4, line 1 - line 27 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0311931  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 7,15 * column 5, line 35 - line 58 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3813104  (KIEFEL HOCHFREQUENZ PAUL [DE]) [A] 7,15 * abstract *;
 [A]US4194313  (DOWNING JACK G [US]) [A] 7,15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4340381  (KIEFEL HOCHFREQUENZ PAUL [DE]) [A] 7,15 * column 8, line 38 - line 45 * * figures 3,5 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07081628 A 19950328 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,6,10-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 95-158651, & JPH0781628 A 19950328 (TOYOTA) [Y] 1,6,10-15 * abstract *