blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992109 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992109



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 101
15.03.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.12.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
06.07.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.07.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.07.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
07.06.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
06.02.2004 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
27.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
27.11.2003 Description Search / examination 4
27.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
25.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
25.09.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.05.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.12.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
29.12.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
17.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
11.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
04.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12