blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992109


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.03.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.05.2005  [2005/18]
01.12.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.06.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.06.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
03.12.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.09.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.05.2003 First examination report
20.05.2003 Examination report or reply
15.05.2003 Renewal fee
21.05.2002 Renewal fee
15.05.2001 Renewal fee
07.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  23.08.2000 [2000/34]
03.03.2000 Change - German title published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
10.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication