blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992109
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002509677Global Dossier 26.03.2002A
Priority number Date
IB9900660 15.04.1999
EP98201371 28.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0992109Global Dossier 12.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP99911972 15.04.1999
IB9900660 15.04.1999
EP98201371 28.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9956399Global Dossier 29.12.1999A3
WO9956399 04.11.1999A2
Priority number Date
EP98201371 28.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1263645 16.08.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98201371 28.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20010014264 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98201371 28.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6408035 18.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
EP98201371 28.04.1998